Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 05/12/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/12/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 05/12/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/12/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/12/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/12/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 05/12/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 05/12/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/12/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 05/12/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/12/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/14/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/14/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/14/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/19/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/19/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/19/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/20/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/01/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/01/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/03/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/03/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/04/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/08/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/08/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/08/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/08/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/08/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/08/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/09/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/09/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/09/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/09/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/09/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/11/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/11/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 06/11/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/15/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/15/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/15/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/16/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/16/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/16/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/17/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/17/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/17/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/23/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/25/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 07/24/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/28/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 08/03/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 08/03/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/08/2009