Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/14/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/18/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/16/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 08/03/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 08/03/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 08/06/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 08/07/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/08/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/16/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 12/02/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 12/18/2009