Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/14/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/14/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/14/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/21/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/08/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/08/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/15/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/21/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/21/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/23/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/24/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/30/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 10/01/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 10/20/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/21/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/22/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/27/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/27/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/27/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 10/27/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 10/27/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/28/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 10/28/2009
Sen. Kirk, Paul Grattan, Jr. [D-MA] 10/28/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 10/29/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/29/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/29/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/29/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/29/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/29/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/29/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/29/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/02/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 11/06/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/18/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 12/07/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/16/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 02/22/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/23/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/05/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/08/2010
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/23/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/24/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/14/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/22/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/27/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/28/2010
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/28/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/28/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/29/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/29/2010
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/13/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/17/2010
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/19/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/24/2010
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/24/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/26/2010
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/10/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/16/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/16/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/17/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/17/2010
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 06/18/2010
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/18/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/21/2010
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/21/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/21/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/22/2010
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/23/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/14/2010
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/27/2010
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/29/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 08/02/2010