Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 05/14/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/14/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 08/05/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 09/16/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/16/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/15/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 10/15/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 11/04/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/04/2009