Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 05/18/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/17/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/18/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/06/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/06/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/06/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/09/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/13/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/14/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/14/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/15/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/15/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/15/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/20/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/22/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/22/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/23/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/24/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/24/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/27/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/27/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/27/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/27/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/29/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/29/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/30/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/31/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 08/03/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 08/06/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/15/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/16/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/23/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/06/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/06/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/13/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/13/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/14/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/20/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 10/29/2009