Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/19/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/02/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/03/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/04/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 06/04/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/11/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/22/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/22/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/23/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 06/23/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/23/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/24/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/06/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/06/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/06/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/06/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/06/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/13/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/13/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/15/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/16/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/22/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/05/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/07/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/05/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/09/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 11/16/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/17/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/17/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/18/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/18/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/18/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 11/19/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 11/19/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/19/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 11/20/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/20/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/30/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/30/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 12/01/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/03/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/10/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 12/14/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 12/14/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/15/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/17/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 01/20/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 01/20/2010
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 01/20/2010
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 01/28/2010
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 01/28/2010
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/28/2010
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/29/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/29/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/01/2010
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 02/02/2010
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 02/02/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/02/2010
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/02/2010
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/22/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/22/2010
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/01/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/10/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew