Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/01/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/16/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 01/20/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/20/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 01/20/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/20/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/21/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/02/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/26/2010