Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/20/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/21/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/24/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/22/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/14/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/22/2010