Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/21/2009
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 05/21/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/21/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/21/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 12/18/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/10/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/18/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/17/2010