There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Rural Transit Improvement and Flexibility Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve transit services, including in rural States.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/03/2009Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/21/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/03/2009Referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate
06/03/2009Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Senate
05/21/2009Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/21/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/21/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/16/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/09/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/22/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation05/21/2009 Referred to
06/03/2009 Discharged from
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs06/03/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1144.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1144. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/21/2009)

Rural Transit Improvement and Flexibility Act of 2009 - Revises the apportionment of nonurbanized formula grants for amounts remaining after apportionment for grants to Indian tribes for public transportation on Indian reservations for FY2006-FY2009. Increases from 20% to 25% the amount of remaining funds to be apportioned to a state based on its land area. Decreases correspondingly from 80% to 75% the amount of remaining funds to be apportioned to a state based on population in nonurbanized areas.

Limits to 25% of its apportionment for a formula grant for a capital project for the special needs of elderly individuals and individuals with disabilities the amount a state may use for operating costs of equipment and facilities.

Limits a grant for operating assistance from exceeding 50% of the net operating project costs. Increases such limit to 62.5% of the government share of project costs in the case of a state containing nontaxable Indian lands, individual and tribal, and public domain lands (both reserved and unreserved), national forests, and national parks and monuments.

Requires the Secretary of Transportation to establish a pilot program for the award of grants to states to establish transit centers to improve transit service (buses and other transit vehicles) in urbanized areas with a population of less than 200,000 and in nonurbanized areas.