Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/21/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/03/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/03/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/08/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/08/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 09/29/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/15/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/27/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/28/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/04/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 11/09/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 11/16/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/17/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 11/19/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 11/19/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/19/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 12/03/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 12/07/2009
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 12/09/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/02/2010