Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 05/21/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/21/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/21/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/21/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/21/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/11/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/16/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/16/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/21/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/20/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/20/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/30/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/10/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/16/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/02/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/15/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/27/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/20/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/20/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/21/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/21/2010
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/29/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/29/2010