Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/21/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/16/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 07/31/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 08/03/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/20/2009