Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/01/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/01/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 06/01/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/04/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/06/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 08/03/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/08/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 10/08/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/09/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/10/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/10/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/16/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/10/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/26/2010