There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Josh Miller HEARTS Act
Josh Miller Helping Everyone Access Responsive Treatment in Schools Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a grant program for automated external defibrillators in elementary and secondary schools.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/08/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
06/08/2009Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/08/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/15/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/30/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/05/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 10/05/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 10/07/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 12/17/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/20/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions06/08/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1197. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/08/2009)

Josh Miller Helping Everyone Access Responsive Treatment in Schools Act of 2009 or the Josh Miller HEARTS Act - Amends the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 to direct the Secretary of Education to award matching grants to local educational agencies (LEAs) to: (1) purchase automated external defibrillators (AEDs) for use in their schools; and/or (2) provide training to meet the grant requirement that at least five adult employees or volunteers at each school where an AED is to be used successfully complete training in its use and in cardiopulmonary resuscitation (CPR).

Requires LEA grant applicants also to demonstrate that: (1) the AEDs are integrated into the schools' emergency response procedures; and (2) emergency services personnel are notified of their locations.

Gives grant priority to schools that: (1) lack an AED; (2) typically have a significant number of students, staff, and visitors present during the day; (3) generally have a longer wait for emergency medical services than other public facilities in the community; and (4) have not received funds under the Rural Access to Emergency Devices Act.