Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/08/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/15/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/30/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/05/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 10/05/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 10/07/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 12/17/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/20/2010