Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/10/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 07/23/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/09/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/09/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/14/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 12/16/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/01/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/10/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/08/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 12/06/2010