Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/09/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/24/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/22/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/01/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/19/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/23/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/26/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/04/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/29/2010