Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 06/10/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/15/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/23/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/25/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/25/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/06/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/18/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/13/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/26/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/26/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 04/29/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/10/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/12/2010