Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/20/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 11/04/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/09/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 02/22/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/21/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/22/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/13/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/13/2010