Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 06/11/2009
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/15/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/15/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/18/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/18/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/24/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/06/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/06/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/14/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/14/2009