Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 06/15/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 06/15/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/16/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/16/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/17/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/23/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/06/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/06/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/10/2009
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/10/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/15/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/15/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/21/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/24/2009