There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

National Foundation on Fitness, Sports, and Nutrition Establishment Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Foundation on Fitness, Sports, and Nutrition Establishment Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Foundation on Fitness, Sports, and Nutrition Establishment Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

National Foundation on Fitness, Sports, and Nutrition Establishment Act

Short Titles as Introduced

National Foundation on Physical Fitness and Sports Establishment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a National Foundation on Physical Fitness and Sports to carry out activities to support and supplement the mission of the President's Council on Physical Fitness and Sports.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/22/2010Became Public Law No: 111-332. (TXT | PDF)
12/22/2010Signed by President.
12/16/2010Presented to President.
12/14/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8322-8323)
12/09/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8690-6892; text as passed Senate: CR S8691-8692)
12/07/2010Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/16/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
12/22/2010Became Public Law No: 111-332. (TXT | PDF)
12/22/2010Signed by President.
12/16/2010SenatePresented to President.
12/14/2010-4:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/14/2010-4:28pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8322-8323)
12/14/2010-4:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1275.
12/14/2010-4:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8321-8324)
12/14/2010-4:14pmHouseMr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/13/2010-11:55amHouseHeld at the desk.
12/13/2010-10:02amHouseReceived in the House.
12/10/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/09/2010SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8690-6892; text as passed Senate: CR S8691-8692)
12/07/2010SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 677.
12/07/2010SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
12/01/2010SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
06/16/2009SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions06/16/2009 Referred to
12/01/2010 Markup by
12/07/2010 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1275. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-332 (12/22/2010)

National Foundation on Fitness, Sports, and Nutrition Establishment Act - Establishes the National Foundation on Fitness, Sports, and Nutrition as a charitable, nonprofit corporation: (1) to develop, in conjunction with the Office of the President's Council on Fitness, Sports and Nutrition, a list and description of activities which would further the purposes and functions outlined in Executive Order 13265 (established the President's Council on Physical Fitness and Sports) and with respect to which combined private and governmental efforts would be beneficial; (2) to promote private organization participation in, and private gifts to support, those activities; and (3) in consultation with such Office, to undertake and support activities to further the purposes and functions of such Executive Order.

Prohibits the Foundation from accepting any federal funds.