Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 03/19/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/13/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 04/21/2010
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/29/2010
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/07/2010
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/21/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/28/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 08/02/2010
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 09/16/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/29/2010