Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/17/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/19/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/07/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/07/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/10/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/15/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/23/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/23/2009