Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/18/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/18/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/18/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/18/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/18/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 06/18/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 06/18/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/18/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 06/18/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL]* 06/18/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/18/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/18/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 06/18/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 06/18/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 06/18/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 06/18/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/25/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/13/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/15/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/23/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/28/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/28/2009
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 07/30/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 08/06/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/21/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/22/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/22/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/24/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/29/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 10/06/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 10/21/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/27/2009
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 10/28/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/14/2010