Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/25/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/16/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/16/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/16/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/20/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/20/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/23/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/23/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/14/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/14/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/01/2010