Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 06/22/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 06/22/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 06/22/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/22/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 06/22/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/22/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 06/22/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 06/22/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 06/22/2009
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/22/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 06/22/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 06/22/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/22/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 06/22/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 06/22/2009
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 06/22/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 06/22/2009
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/25/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/25/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/25/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/07/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/17/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 02/04/2010
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/09/2010