Text: S.1335 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/24/2009)


111th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. 1335


To require reports on the effectiveness and impacts of the implementation of the Western Hemisphere Travel Initiative, and for other purposes.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

June 24, 2009

Mrs. Murray introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs


A BILL

To require reports on the effectiveness and impacts of the implementation of the Western Hemisphere Travel Initiative, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “WHTI Implementation Monitoring Plan to Assure Continued Travel and Trade Act of 2009” or the “IMPACTT Act of 2009”.

SEC. 2. Definitions.

In this Act:

(1) MAJOR BORDER CROSSINGS.—The term “major border crossings” means the 16 land ports of entry along the international land border between the United States and Canada scheduled to be equipped with RFID technology as of June 1, 2009.

(2) RFID.—The term “RFID” means radio-frequency identification.

(3) WHTI.—The term “WHTI” means the Western Hemisphere Travel Initiative required under section 7209(b) of the Intelligence Reform and Terrorism Prevention Act of 2004 (8 U.S.C. 1185 note).

SEC. 3. Reports on implementation of the Western Hemisphere Travel Initiative.

(a) In general.—Not later than December 1, 2009, and June 1, 2010, the Secretary of Homeland Security and the Secretary of State shall jointly submit a report to Congress that describes the implementation of WHTI, with respect to the international land and maritime border between the United States and Canada.

(b) Contents.—Each report submitted under subsection (a) shall include—

(1) a description of the effects on travel and trade across the international land and maritime border between the United States and Canada due to the implementation of WHTI, including—

(A) an analysis of the economic impact of WHTI;

(B) monthly figures for passenger and freight border crossings; and

(C) the effects of WHTI, if any, on travel delays at major border crossings;

(2) an accounting of the enrollment into frequent traveler programs, including NEXUS and enrollment for passport cards;

(3) an analysis of the effectiveness of RFID technology, including an analysis of RFID infrastructure installation;

(4) United States Customs and Border Protection staffing levels along the international land and maritime border between the United States and Canada; and

(5) an analysis of the effect of WHTI on overall border security along the international land and maritime border between the United States and Canada.

(c) GAO study.—Not later than 90 days after the submission of each of the reports required under subsection (a), the Comptroller General of the United States shall submit a report to Congress that describes—

(1) the economic impact of WHTI; and

(2) the effect of WHTI on overall border security with respect to the international land and maritime border between the United States and Canada.