Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/24/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/08/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/14/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/14/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 09/15/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/23/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/29/2009
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 10/13/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 10/14/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/15/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/19/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 10/20/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 10/20/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/22/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/22/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/28/2010