Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 06/24/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/25/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/25/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 07/07/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/07/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/07/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/21/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/21/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/21/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/23/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/27/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/28/2009