There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Crimes Against Humanity Act of 2010

Short Titles as Introduced

Crimes Against Humanity Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to penalize crimes against humanity and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
07/21/2010Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/24/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
07/21/2010Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 474.
Action By: Senate
07/21/2010Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/06/2010Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/24/2009Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7011-7012)
Action By: Senate
06/24/2009Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S7010-7011, S7012)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/24/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 06/24/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/20/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/22/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/24/2009 Referred to
05/06/2010 Markup by
07/21/2010 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.1346.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1346. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (07/21/2010)

Crimes Against Humanity Act of 2010 - Amends the federal criminal code to impose a fine and/or prison term of up to 20 years (or any term of years or for life if death results from a violation of the prohibitions of this Act) on any person who commits or engages in conduct that would violate specified federal criminal laws (including murder, kidnapping, peonage, involuntary servitude, forced labor or trafficking in persons, sex trafficking of children, sexual abuse, hostage taking, torture, extermination, national, ethnic, racial, or religious cleansing, or measures intended to prevent births) as part of a widespread (not less than 50 victims) and systematic attack against any civilian population, with knowledge of the attack.

Provides for jurisdiction to prosecute a violation of this Act if: (1) the alleged offender is a U.S. national, an alien residing in the United States, or a stateless person whose habitual residence is in the United States; or (2) the offense is committed in whole or in part within the United States. Exempts prosecutions under this Act from any statute of limitations.

Prohibits a prosecution for a violation of this Act in the United States unless the Attorney General certifies in writing that: (1) there is no foreign jurisdiction prepared to prosecute a violation of this Act and a prosecution by the United States is in the public interest and necessary to secure substantial justice; and (2) the Secretaries of State and Defense and the Director of National Intelligence do not object to a prosecution.

Provides that nothing in this Act shall be construed to: (1) make unlawful conduct pursuant to the laws of war; (2) limit or extinguish any otherwise available defense or immunity; (3) support ratification of, or participation by the United States in, the Rome Statute of the International Criminal Court; or (4) repeal or limit the applicability of the American Servcemembers' Protection Act of 2002.