Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/06/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/09/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/28/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/06/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/13/2010