Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/30/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/02/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/04/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/07/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/28/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/12/2010