Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/09/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 08/06/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/08/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/08/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/23/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 11/15/2010