Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/15/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/21/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/23/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 08/03/2009
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 09/08/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/16/2009