Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/24/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/30/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 10/01/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/07/2009