Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/06/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/06/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/08/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 08/03/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/08/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/14/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/23/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 09/30/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/07/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/13/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/14/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 11/09/2009
Sen. Kirk, Paul Grattan, Jr. [D-MA] 11/09/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 12/09/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/13/2010
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/19/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/28/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/30/2010