Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/06/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/15/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/29/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/13/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/29/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 11/16/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 12/06/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 12/11/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 12/15/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 01/20/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/26/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 01/28/2010