Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 07/06/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/07/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 08/06/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/08/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 12/07/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 01/28/2010