Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 07/07/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 07/07/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 07/07/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/30/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/30/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/30/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/30/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/30/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/30/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/30/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/30/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/30/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 08/04/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 08/04/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 08/04/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 08/05/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 08/06/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 08/06/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/06/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 08/07/2009