Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 07/07/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/20/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/22/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 08/03/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/14/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/17/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 12/23/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/25/2010