Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 07/08/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 07/08/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/21/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 10/05/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 10/14/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 01/28/2010
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 03/17/2010