There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Airline Flight Crew Technical Corrections Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Airline Flight Crew Technical Corrections Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Airline Flight Crew Technical Corrections Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993 to clarify the eligibility requirements with respect to airline flight crews.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/21/2009Became Public Law No: 111-119. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2009Signed by President.
12/09/2009Presented to President.
12/02/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H13398)
11/10/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S11353-11354)
11/10/2009Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/09/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
12/21/2009Became Public Law No: 111-119. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2009Signed by President.
12/09/2009SenatePresented to President.
12/02/2009-11:18amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/02/2009-11:18amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H13398)
12/02/2009-11:11amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1422.
12/02/2009-11:11amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H13398-13399)
12/02/2009-11:11amHouseMr. Bishop (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/16/2009-7:49pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/16/2009-7:39pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/16/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/10/2009SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S11353-11354)
11/10/2009SenateS.Amdt.2780 Amendment SA 2780 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/10/2009SenateS.Amdt.2780 Amendment SA 2780 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Murray. (consideration: CR S11353; text: CR S11353) To clarify a requirement concerning hours of service.
11/10/2009SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S11353-11354)
11/10/2009SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/09/2009SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7320)
07/09/2009SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S7320)

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/09/2009 Referred to
11/10/2009 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1422. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-119 (12/09/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on November 10, 2009. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Airline Flight Crew Technical Corrections Act - Amends the Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993 with respect to the hours-of-service requirement airline flight crews must meet to be eligible for leave under such Act.

Declares that a flight attendant or flight crewmember will be considered to meet such requirement if he or she has worked or been paid for: (1) at least 60% of the applicable total monthly guarantee, or the equivalent for the previous 12-month period for or by the employer with respect to whom such leave is requested; and (2) a minimum of 504 hours (not counting personal commute time spent on vacation leave or medical or sick leave) during such period.

Authorizes the Secretary of Labor to provide, by regulation, a method for calculating such leave for airline flight crews.