Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 07/09/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 07/09/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 07/09/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/23/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/24/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/31/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/30/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/03/2010
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 09/14/2010