There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Modernize Our Bookkeeping In the Law for Employee's Cell Phone Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to remove cell phones from listed property under section 280F.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/06/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/06/2009Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate
01/06/2009Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S129)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 01/06/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 01/14/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 01/14/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 01/14/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 01/14/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 01/14/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 01/14/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/22/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 01/29/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/29/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/29/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/05/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/05/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/05/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/05/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 02/09/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/13/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/24/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/24/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/02/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/04/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/18/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/18/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/18/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/18/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/24/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/21/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/21/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/23/2009
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 04/23/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/29/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/29/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/30/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/30/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/06/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/06/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 05/07/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/12/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/12/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/12/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/12/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/03/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/03/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/03/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/11/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/17/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/23/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/25/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/25/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/25/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/25/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/25/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/07/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/07/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/08/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/09/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/14/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/15/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/20/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/21/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 08/04/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 08/07/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/08/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/10/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/23/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/23/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/06/2009
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 12/07/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 12/18/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/18/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 02/04/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/04/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance01/06/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.144. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/06/2009)

Modernize Our Bookkeeping In the Law for Employee's Cell Phone Act of 2009 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to remove certain limitations on the tax deduction for employee use of cellular telephones.