Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 01/06/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 01/14/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 01/14/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 01/14/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 01/14/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 01/14/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 01/14/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/22/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 01/29/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/29/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/29/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/05/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/05/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/05/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/05/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 02/09/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/13/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/24/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/24/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/02/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/04/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/18/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/18/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/18/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/18/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/24/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/21/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/21/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/23/2009
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 04/23/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/29/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/29/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/30/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/30/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/06/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/06/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 05/07/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/12/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/12/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/12/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/12/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/03/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/03/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/03/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/11/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/17/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/23/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/25/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/25/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/25/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/25/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/25/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/07/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/07/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/08/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/09/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/14/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/15/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/20/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/21/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 08/04/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 08/07/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/08/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/10/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/23/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/23/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/06/2009
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 12/07/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 12/18/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/18/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 02/04/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/04/2010