Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 07/10/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 07/10/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/22/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/21/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/27/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/12/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/24/2010