Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/06/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/06/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/06/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/06/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 01/06/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 01/06/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/06/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 02/25/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/30/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/04/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/01/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 11/03/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/20/2009

Show cosponsors who withdrew