Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/30/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/02/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 06/16/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 08/06/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/19/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/26/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/18/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 11/19/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/09/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/11/2010